MO SB642 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Video Lottery Control Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Video Lottery Control Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |