MO SB641 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an income tax deduction for payments received as part of a program that compensates agricultural producers for losses from disaster or emergency
Title
Creates an income tax deduction for payments received as part of a program that compensates agricultural producers for losses from disaster or emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 641 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 641 (HCA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 641 (HCA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 113 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 641 (HCA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 641 (HCA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 113 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-03 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-03 | House | HCA 1 H defeated |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review w/HCA 1 |
2016-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review w/Amendments |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means |
2016-04-12 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Ways and Means |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 641-Schatz |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |