MO SB640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 640-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 640-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of the personal income tax cut and the business income deduction in current law
Title
Increases the amount of the personal income tax cut and the business income deduction in current law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 640-Onder |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 640-Onder |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26837999 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB640.pdf |