MO SB640 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 640-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 640-Sater
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows students to possess and self-apply sunscreen at school without a parent or physician's approval
Title
Allows students to possess and self-apply sunscreen at school without a parent or physician's approval
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 640-Sater |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 640-Sater |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471845 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB640.pdf |