MO SB639 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This act lowers, from fifty to twenty-five, the minimum number of members an association must have in order to purchase group health insurance
Title
This act lowers, from fifty to twenty-five, the minimum number of members an association must have in order to purchase group health insurance
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 639-Sater |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471844 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB639.pdf |