MO SB632 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies several provisions relating to taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies several provisions relating to taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2018-05-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-11HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-10HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2018-05-10HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-08HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means
2018-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
2018-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H Ways and Means
2018-04-04HouseReferred H Ways and Means
2018-03-12HouseH Second Read
2018-03-08HouseH First Read
2018-03-08SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-03-08SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-03-08SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-02-28SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-02-27SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-02-27SenatePerfected
2018-02-27SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2018-02-27SenateSA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rowden)--(5125S03.02F)
2018-02-27SenateSA 2 to SCS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(5125S03.01S)
2018-02-27SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(5125S03.01F)
2018-02-15SenateReported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS
2018-02-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 632 & 675) S Economic Development Committee (5125S.03C)
2018-01-30SenateHearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee
2018-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 632-Dixon
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback