MO SB631 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 631 (HA 3, E.C.) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 90 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 631 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 132 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 631 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 121 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 631 (HA 3, E.C.) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 116 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 631 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 631 (HA 3) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 631 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 631 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 631 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 631 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 19 NV: 16 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: SB 631 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04SenateSigned by Governor
2020-05-27SenateDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27SenateConstitutional Objection filed in House
2020-05-27SenateSigned by House Speaker
2020-05-27SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2020-05-27SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2020-05-15SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2020-05-15SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2020-05-15SenateH adopts CCR
2020-05-15HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2020-05-15HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(3746S07.1SR)
2020-05-15HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-15HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-14HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-14HouseH distributes CCR--(3746S07.1SR)
2020-05-14HouseSenate conferees appointed: Hegeman, Crawford, Rowden, Rizzo, Sifton
2020-05-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: Shaul-113, Simmons, McGaugh, Windham, Price
2020-05-14HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2020-05-14HouseS refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, & HA 3 and requests H recede or grant conference
2020-05-14HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
2020-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-14HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-14HouseHA 3 H offered & adopted (Chipman)--(3746S02.02H)
2020-05-14HouseHA 2 H offered & adopted (Shaul-113)--(3746S02.12H)
2020-05-14HouseHA 1 H offered & adopted (Shaul-113)--(3746S02.10H)
2020-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-08HouseExecutive Session CANCELLED H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-04-30HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-04-30HouseReported Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials
2020-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials
2020-03-11HouseHearing Conducted H Elections and Elected Officials
2020-03-05HouseReferred H Elections and Elected Officials
2020-03-04HouseH Second Read
2020-03-03HouseH First Read
2020-03-03SenateS Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2020-03-02SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-02-27SenatePerfected
2020-02-27SenateSCS S adopted
2020-02-13SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
2020-02-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (3746S.02C)
2020-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2020-01-16SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 631-Hegeman
2019-12-02SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26837998
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB631.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/SCSfromResearch/SB631.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/comm/SB631.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/perf/SB631.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/tat/SB631.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay290303416-443.pdf#417
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.019.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.018.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.015.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.016.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/063.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.026.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.027.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.028.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.025.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback