MO SB63 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the monitoring of certain controlled substances
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the monitoring of certain controlled substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House: SB 63 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 83 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: SB 63 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: SB 63 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2021-05-10 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-03 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Action postponed |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2021-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2021-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2021-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2021-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2021-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Perfected |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 6 to SS S defeated |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 6 to SS S offered & defeated (Moon)--(0510S02.16S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 6 to SS S offered (Moon)--(0510S02.12S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 5 to SS S defeated |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 5 to SS S offered & defeated (Moon)--(0510S02.15S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 5 to SS S offered (Moon)--(0510S02.13S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(0510S02.14S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Riddle)--(0510S02.02S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & defeated (Brattin)--(0510S02.04S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Moon)--(0510S02.10S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | SS S offered (Rehder)--(0510S.02F) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |