MO SB627 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to agriculture

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to agriculture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 627 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 627 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 627 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseSigned by Governor
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker
2018-05-30HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2018-05-30HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2018-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2018-05-17HouseH Third Read and Passed
2018-05-17HouseHA 1 H offered & defeated (Lavender)--(4296S0315H)
2018-05-11HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2018-05-09HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-05-03HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-05-03HouseExecutive Session Conducted H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-04-17HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-04-17HouseReported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy
2018-04-17HouseVoted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy
2018-04-10HouseHearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy
2018-04-04HouseReferred H Agriculture Policy
2018-03-12HouseH Second Read
2018-03-08HouseH First Read
2018-03-08SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-03-07SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-03-07SenatePerfected
2018-03-07SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2018-03-07SenateSA 3 for SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(4296S03.04S)
2018-03-07SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(4296S03.01S)
2018-03-07SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Wallingford)--(4296S03.02S)
2018-03-07SenateSS for SCS S offered (Munzlinger)--(4296S.03F)
2018-02-22SenateReported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS
2018-02-22SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 627 & 925) Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (4296S.02C)
2018-02-22SenateCommittee Vote Reconsidered
2018-02-05SenateVoted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 627-Munzlinger
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback