MO SB626 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limits liability for a manufacturer after a product has been materially altered and modifies certain interest rates
Title
Limits liability for a manufacturer after a product has been materially altered and modifies certain interest rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2012-05-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Committee Voted Reconsidered H General Laws Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H General Laws Committee | |
2012-03-23 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-22 | H First Read | |
2012-03-22 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Perfected | |
2012-03-21 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-03-05 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5135S.04C) | |
2012-02-06 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-09 | S First Read--SB 626-Kehoe |