MO SB623 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to foreclosure proceeds
Title
Modifies provisions relating to foreclosure proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: SB 623 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: SB 623 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-04-19 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-19 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2018-04-18 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | HCS H adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-03-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2018-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-13 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (4359S.02C) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 623-Crawford |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |