MO SB621 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions of law regarding the publication of the statutes, garnishments, criminal procedure, judicial resources, court surcharges, law enforcement liability, and crime prevention
Title
Modifies various provisions of law regarding the publication of the statutes, garnishments, criminal procedure, judicial resources, court surcharges, law enforcement liability, and crime prevention
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR#2 H adopted |
2014-05-15 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-05-15 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (4246S08.1SR) |
2014-05-14 | House | H submits CCR#2 (4246S08.1SR) |
2014-05-14 | House | H conferees appointed: Cox, Cornejo, Colona |
2014-05-14 | House | S conferees appointed: Dixon, Schmitt, Schaefer, Justus, Keaveny |
2014-05-14 | House | H grants further conference |
2014-05-13 | House | S requests further conference |
2014-05-13 | House | S refused to adopt CCR |
2014-05-13 | House | Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn |
2014-05-13 | House | CCR S offered (4246S07.1SR) |
2014-05-13 | House | H submits CCR (4246S07.1SR) |
2014-05-08 | House | S conferees appointed: Dixon, Schmitt, Schaefer, Justus, Keaveny |
2014-05-08 | House | H conferees appointed: Cox, Cornejo, Colona |
2014-05-08 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2014-05-07 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2014-05-07 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-07 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (English)--(4246H05.05H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Elmer)--(4246H05.30H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Leara)--(4246H05.35H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haefner)--(4246H05.25H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Conway)--(4246H05.24H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(4246H05.01H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Austin)--(4246H05.38H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4246H05.14H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-45)--(4246H05.36H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(4246H05.21H) |
2014-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4246H05.17H) |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred H Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor-Consent |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 621-Dixon |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |