MO SB620 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies composition of the Career and Technical Education Advisory Council and requires said council to establish minimum requirement for a career and technical education certificate
Title
Modifies composition of the Career and Technical Education Advisory Council and requires said council to establish minimum requirement for a career and technical education certificate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House: SB 620 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-04-26 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-04-26 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2016-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2016-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Education |
2016-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Education |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues in Education |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues in Education |
2016-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-09 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-09 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S defeated |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-03 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(4558S02.01S) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2016-01-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 620 & 582) S Education Committee (4558S.02C) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 620-Romine |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |