MO SB617 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Food Production And Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Food Production And Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to feral hogs
Title
Modifies provisions relating to feral hogs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 617-Wallingford |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246482 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB617.pdf |