MO SB612 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 612-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 612-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Senate to try all impeachments and modifies what constitutes grounds for impeachment
Title
Requires the Senate to try all impeachments and modifies what constitutes grounds for impeachment
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 612-Emery, with SCS |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3253S.04C) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 612-Emery |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |