MO SB612 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
Pending: House Select Committee on General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
Pending: House Select Committee on General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the offense of illegal reentry
Title
Modifies the law relating to the offense of illegal reentry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCA 1 |
2016-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/Amendments |
2016-05-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2016-04-25 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(4405S03.04S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Cunningham)--(4405S03.03S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | SS S offered (Cunningham)--(4405S.03F) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 612-Cunningham |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |