MO SB611 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBS 617, 611 & 667)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Bill Combined w/(SCS SBS 617, 611 & 667)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Bill Combined w/(SCS SBS 617, 611 & 667) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 611-Koenig |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471958 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB611.pdf |