MO SB610 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts new provisions allowing employer policies relating to employee drug use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts new provisions allowing employer policies relating to employee drug use

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
2020-02-20SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
2020-01-16SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 610-Sater
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback