MO SB61 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 61-Hegeman, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions regulating the use of flashing lights by certain stationary vehicles on roads

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions regulating the use of flashing lights by certain stationary vehicles on roads

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 61-Hegeman, with SCS
2017-03-30SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-03-02SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2017-02-02SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (0415S.02C)
2017-01-19SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 61-Hegeman
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback