MO SB609 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies applicability of electronic communication of insurance documents to other provisions of law
Title
Modifies applicability of electronic communication of insurance documents to other provisions of law
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] | Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-04-29 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2014-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee - Consent |
2014-04-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee - Consent |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Insurance Policy Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(4744S01.01S) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 609-Rupp |
2013-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |