MO SB606 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions which require persons who solicit on behalf of prepaid legal services to be licensed as an insurance agent

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals provisions which require persons who solicit on behalf of prepaid legal services to be licensed as an insurance agent

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10SenateSigned by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-01SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-01HouseS Third Read and Passed
2014-05-01HouseS concurs in HCS
2014-04-29HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-04-29HouseHCS H adopted
2014-04-17HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-17HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-10HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-10HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-02HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
2014-03-26HouseReferred H Judiciary Committee
2014-03-04HouseH Second Read
2014-03-03HouseH First Read
2014-02-27SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2014-02-20SenateReported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor - Consent
2014-02-18SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee - Consent vote adopted
2014-02-18SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-02-11SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-16SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 606-Dixon
2013-12-04SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback