MO SB604 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Corrections to offer certain educational and job training programs to inmates
Title
Requires the Department of Corrections to offer certain educational and job training programs to inmates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 604-Curls |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246570 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB604.pdf |