MO SB602 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 602, 778 & 561-Luetkemeyer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 602, 778 & 561-Luetkemeyer, with SCS
2020-03-05SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS
2020-02-17SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 602, 778 & 561) Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3454S.07C)
2020-01-13SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 602-Luetkemeyer
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback