MO SB601 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes a deduction for energy efficiency audits and projects for tax years 2014 to 2020
Title
Reauthorizes a deduction for energy efficiency audits and projects for tax years 2014 to 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Utilities Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Utilities Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Utilities Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred H Utilities Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2014-03-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 601-Holsman |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |