MO SB600 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - H First Read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to dangerous felonies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to dangerous felonies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseH First Read
2020-02-20SenateS Third Read and Passed
2020-02-20SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-20SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-13SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-13SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-02-12SenatePerfected
2020-02-12SenateSS S adopted
2020-02-12SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & Ruled out of order (Schupp)--(3178S08.06S)
2020-02-12SenateSS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3178S.08F)
2020-02-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-01-27SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-21SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-13SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 600-Luetkemeyer
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback