MO SB600 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to dangerous felonies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to dangerous felonies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 600 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 600 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 11) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 12) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 10) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 1 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06HouseSigned by Governor
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker
2020-05-27HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2020-05-27HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2020-05-15HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2020-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed
2020-05-15HouseHCS, as amended, H defeated
2020-05-05HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-05-05HouseHA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mayhew)--(3178H10.32H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ross)--(3178H10.45H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(3178H10.03H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 10 to HCS H adopted--(3178H10.13H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & ruled out of order (Razer)--(3178H10.66H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 10 to HCS H offered (Coleman)--(3178H10.13H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(3178H10.34H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.15H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 2 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hill)--(3178H10.70H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Basye)--(3178H10.62H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 8 to HCS H offered (Taylor)--(3178H10.15H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(3178H10.02H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.47H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 3 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--3178H10.63H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 2 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(3178H10.60H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & defeated (Merideth)--(3178H10.56H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered (Roberts)--(3178H10.47H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(3178H10.04H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.14H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lovasco)--(3178H10.58H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered (Taylor)--(3178H10.14H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(3178H10.35H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.07H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(3178H10.59H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered (Hicks)--(3178H10.07H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.06H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Merideth)--(3178H10.64H)
2020-05-05HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered (Schroer)--(3178H10.06H)
2020-05-04HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-04HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-01HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-04-30HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-04-30HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-04-30HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-04-29HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-04-29HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-04-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-04-28HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-03-11HouseReferred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
2020-02-24HouseH Second Read
2020-02-20HouseH First Read
2020-02-20SenateS Third Read and Passed
2020-02-20SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-20SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-13SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-13SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-02-12SenatePerfected
2020-02-12SenateSS S adopted
2020-02-12SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & Ruled out of order (Schupp)--(3178S08.06S)
2020-02-12SenateSS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3178S.08F)
2020-02-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-01-27SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-21SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-13SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 600-Luetkemeyer
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838053
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB600.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/perf/SB600.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0600.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/tat/SB600.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay230220334-350.pdf#339
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/056.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/064.019.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback