MO SB600 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts new provisions relating to professional employer organizations
Title
Enacts new provisions relating to professional employer organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2018-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2018-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2018-03-12 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-08 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-08 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(4505S07.01S) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Schatz)--(4505S.07F) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (4505S.04C) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Re-referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 600-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |