MO SB60 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to victims of certain crimes including rental agreements and prostitution and penalties of promoting prostitution in the first degree

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to victims of certain crimes including rental agreements and prostitution and penalties of promoting prostitution in the first degree

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
2019-05-16HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-15HouseBill Placed on Formal Calendar
2019-05-14HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session Cancelled H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-01HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2019-05-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-04-25HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-04-17HouseReferred H Special Committee on Criminal Justice
2019-04-17HouseH Second Read
2019-04-16HouseH First Read
2019-04-16SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-04-15SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-04-11SenatePerfected
2019-04-11SenateSCS, as amended, S adopted
2019-04-11SenateSA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (White)--(0147S03.04S)
2019-04-11SenateSA 2 to SCS withdrawn
2019-04-11SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-04-11SenateSA 2 to SCS S offered (Nasheed)--(0147S03.02S)
2019-04-11SenateSA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Onder)--(0147S03.01S)
2019-04-04SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-03-28SenateReported from S Small Business and Industry Committee w/SCS
2019-03-07SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0147S.03C)
2019-02-28SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
2019-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 60-Arthur
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback