MO SB598 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies eligibility of retirement benefits resulting from membership in multiple defined benefit plans established by a state or local retirement system
Title
Modifies eligibility of retirement benefits resulting from membership in multiple defined benefit plans established by a state or local retirement system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S First Read |