MO SB595 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 595-Hough, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to personal care assistance services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to personal care assistance services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 595-Hough, with SCS
2020-03-02SenateReported from S Appropriations Committee w/SCS
2020-02-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Appropriations Committee (3328S.03C)
2020-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee
2020-02-06SenateHearing Cancelled S Appropriations Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 595-Hough
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback