MO SB592 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 592-White
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions related to water and sewer infrastructure rate adjustments for water and sewer corporations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions related to water and sewer infrastructure rate adjustments for water and sewer corporations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 592-White
2020-02-18SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-01-30SenateReported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-01-29SenateVoted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-01-22SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 592-White
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback