MO SB591 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 591-Hegeman, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 591-Hegeman, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Implements a cap on the Low Income Housing Tax Credit
Title
Implements a cap on the Low Income Housing Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 591-Hegeman, with SCS |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4241S.04C) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 591-Hegeman |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |