MO SB587 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 587-Sifton |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471938 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB587.pdf |