MO SB586 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the definition of "current operating expenditures" and "state adequacy target" for the purposes of state funding and applies the definition of "average daily attendance" to charter schools
Title
Modifies the definition of "current operating expenditures" and "state adequacy target" for the purposes of state funding and applies the definition of "average daily attendance" to charter schools
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] | Rep. Kathryn Swan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House: SB 586 VETOED SENATE BILLS (Y: 113 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: SB 586 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 116 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: SB 586 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: SB 586 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 116 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: SB 586 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2016-05-05 | House | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2016-05-04 | House | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2016-05-04 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-04-19 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-04-19 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-04-19 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2016-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-01 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 586 & 651) S Education Committee (4833S.07C) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 586-Wasson |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |