MO SB584 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateNo motion to override Governor's veto
2014-06-11SenateVetoed by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-16SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2014-05-16SenateCCR H adopted
2014-05-16HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2014-05-16HouseCCR S offered & adopted (4396S08.1SR)
2014-05-15HouseH submits CCR
2014-05-15HouseS conferees appointed: Dixon, Kraus, Lager, Sifton, LeVota
2014-05-15HouseH conferees appointed: Burlison, Koenig, Carpenter
2014-05-15HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2014-05-15HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2014-05-15HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2014-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-05-15HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-05-15HouseHA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-05-15HouseHA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(4396H07.32H)
2014-05-15HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered (Diehl)--(4396H07.08H)
2014-05-15HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Guernsey)--(4396H07.28H)
2014-05-15HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Neth)--(4396H07.21H)
2014-05-15HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Koenig)--(4396H07.25H)
2014-05-15HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(4396H07.24H)
2014-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-07HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2014-05-06HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-06HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-30HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-29HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-22HouseHearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-08HouseReferred H Ways and Means Committee
2014-04-07HouseH Second Read
2014-04-03HouseH First Read
2014-04-03SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-04-03SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
2014-04-03SenateVoted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-04-02SenateReferred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-04-02SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-04-01SenatePerfected, as amended
2014-04-01SenateSA 2 S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(4396S01.01S)
2014-04-01SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(4396S01.02S)
2014-03-13SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor
2014-02-06SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2014-01-30SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2014-01-16SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 584-Dixon
2013-12-03SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback