MO SB582 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to wages paid by sheltered workshops

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to wages paid by sheltered workshops

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
2021-04-15SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
2021-03-31SenateVoted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
2021-03-24SenateHearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
2021-03-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
2021-03-01SenateS First Read

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback