MO SB580 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading--w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading--w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to healthcare
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to healthcare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (*HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 66 N: 75 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 6) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 6) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 7, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 1 HA 10) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (*HA 10, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 10, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 6) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 6) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 7, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 1 HA 10) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (*HA 10, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 580 (HA 10, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading--w/HCS |
2020-05-07 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 10 to HCS, as amended, H aodpted |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered (Taylor)--(3142H06.77H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered (Ross)--(3142H06.12H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 9 to HCS H adopted |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Bland Manlove)--(3142H06.22H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered (Rehder)--(3142H06.13H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sommer)--(3142H06.48H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(3142H06.71H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Deaton)--(3142H06.09H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Young)--(3142H06.28H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hill)--(3142H06.66H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Patterson)--(3142H06.32H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 4 to HCS H adopted |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 2 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (McDaniel)--(3142H06.58H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Taylor)--(3142H06.61H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Baker)--(3142H06.18H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wood)--(3142H06.54H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Morse)--(3142H06.08H) |
2020-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Swan)--(3142H06.14H) |
2020-05-07 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-27 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2020-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2020-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-02-13 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S withdrawn |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Point of order (Eigel) SA 2 goes beyond scope of bill - taken under advisement |
2020-02-11 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Hough)--(3142S04.01S) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(3142S04.02S) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | SS S offered (Cierpiot)--(3142S.04F) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 580-Cierpiot |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |