MO SB58 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and repeals a number of existing, expired or obsolete committees
Title
Modifies and repeals a number of existing, expired or obsolete committees
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | HCS H defeated |
2015-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Continued - Action postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCA 1 |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2015-03-18 | House | H Second Read |
2015-03-17 | House | H First Read |
2015-03-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-11 | Senate | SS for S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(0286S.03F) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 58-Dixon |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |