MO SB579 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 579-Libla (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to certain crimes against emergency service providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to certain crimes against emergency service providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SS for SB 579-Libla (In Fiscal Oversight)
2018-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-01-31SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-01-30SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-01-30SenatePerfected
2018-01-30SenateSS, as amended, S adopted
2018-01-30SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Libla)--(4239S03.10S)
2018-01-30SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Nasheed)--(4239S03.01F)
2018-01-30SenateSS S offered (Libla)--(4239S.03F)
2018-01-18SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-01-18SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-01-11SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-01-08SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 579-Libla
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback