MO SB578 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 578-Crawford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the certification of documents, including certification by the recorder of deeds and notaries public

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the certification of documents, including certification by the recorder of deeds and notaries public

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateFormal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 578-Crawford, with SCS
2020-03-02SenateReported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
2020-02-27SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (3339S.03C)
2020-02-12SenateHearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
2020-02-05SenateHearing Cancelled S Local Government and Elections Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 578-Crawford
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback