MO SB575 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 575-Eigel, with SS#2 & SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 575-Eigel, with SS#2 & SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for a claimant in an action for damages due to asbestos exposure to disclose claims filed with an asbestos trust
Title
Establishes procedures for a claimant in an action for damages due to asbestos exposure to disclose claims filed with an asbestos trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 575-Eigel, with SS#2 & SA 2 (pending) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 S offered (Rizzo)--(3889S08.22S) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered & defeated (Walsh)--(3889S08.21S) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (Eigel)--(3889S.10F) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered (Walsh)--(3889S08.23S) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Walsh)--(3889S08.14S) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SS S offered (Eigel)--(3889S.08F) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 575-Eigel |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838098 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB575.pdf |