MO SB570 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the provisions of law relating to campaign finance
Title
Modifies the provisions of law relating to campaign finance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 570-Pearce |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246471 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB570.pdf |