MO SB563 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to MO HealthNet and the MO RX Plan
Title
Modifies provisions relating to MO HealthNet and the MO RX Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Budget |
2018-05-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Budget |
2018-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Budget |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-01 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 563-Sater |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |