MO SB562 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 538, 562 & 601)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 538, 562 & 601)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases penalties for the offense of armed criminal action
Title
Increases penalties for the offense of armed criminal action
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 538, 562 & 601) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 562-Onder |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838162 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB562.pdf |