MO SB561 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
Pending: House Tourism And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee
Pending: House Tourism And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a permit for hobby manufacturers of fireworks
Title
Creates a permit for hobby manufacturers of fireworks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-27 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 561-Munzlinger |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |