MO SB558 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to common sewer districts
Title
Modifies provisions relating to common sewer districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | S First Read |