MO SB558 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 558-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 558-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that personnel of certain municipal police forces will not be subject to a residency requirement
Title
Provides that personnel of certain municipal police forces will not be subject to a residency requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 558-Schatz, with SCS |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2020-01-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (3584S.02C) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 558-Schatz |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |