MO SB555 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 555-Nasheed, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 555-Nasheed, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes campaign contribution limits and bans certain lobbyist gifts
Title
Imposes campaign contribution limits and bans certain lobbyist gifts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 555-Nasheed, with SS & SA 1 (pending) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-02 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Sater)--(4095S03.08S) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | SS S offered (Nasheed)--(4095S.03F) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 555-Nasheed |
2013-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723595 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB555.pdf |