MO SB554 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (2414S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (2414S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that quarries and mining equipment will be assessed based on the previous year's production
Title
Specifies that quarries and mining equipment will be assessed based on the previous year's production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (2414S.03C) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 554-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4721666 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB554.pdf |