MO SB553 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Missouri Parkinson's Disease Registry Act"
Title
Establishes the "Missouri Parkinson's Disease Registry Act"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | S First Read |